MO HB894 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates November 30th of each year as "Mark Twain Day"
Title
Designates November 30th of each year as "Mark Twain Day"
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-17 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |