MO HB873 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the State of Missouri from recollecting certain incorrectly distributed employment security benefits
Title
Prohibits the State of Missouri from recollecting certain incorrectly distributed employment security benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Ian Mackey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |