MO HB852 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits expenditures of public funds for research projects involving abortion services, human cloning, and prohibited human research
Title
Prohibits expenditures of public funds for research projects involving abortion services, human cloning, and prohibited human research
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Walsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |