MO HB850 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
Pending: House Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions for ballot summary language adopted by the general assembly

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions for ballot summary language adopted by the general assembly

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - House: HB 850 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-05-14SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2021-05-13SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 AYES: 22 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
2021-05-13SenateTaken Up
2021-05-13SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2021-05-13SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2021-05-13SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-05-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-05-13SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, May 13, 3:15 p.m., SCR 1
2021-05-12SenateReferred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) - SS/SA 2, SA 3, SA 4
2021-05-12SenateSS Adopted (S)
2021-05-12SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2021-05-12SenateTaken Up
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-04-14SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2021-04-14SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2021-04-14SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-04-14SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-03-30SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 31, 1 pm, SCR 1
2021-03-25SenateSecond read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
2021-03-22HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-03-22HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-22HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-03-10HousePerfected (H)
2021-03-10HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-03-10HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-03-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-11HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-28HouseReferred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
2021-01-15HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB850&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1888H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1888H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1888S.10F.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1888S10.01F.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0850I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1888H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0850C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1888H.01P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0850P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1888S.10A.ORG.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/039.002.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback