MO HB85 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Second Amendment Preservation Act," which creates additional protections to the right to bear arms
Title
Establishes the "Second Amendment Preservation Act," which creates additional protections to the right to bear arms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 85 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 108 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 85 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 85 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 85 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: HB 85 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: HB 85 (*HA 1 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 108 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - House - House: HB 85 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 18 NV: 24 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: HB 85 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 85 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 85 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: HB 85 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: HB 85 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: HB 85 (*HA 1 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 43 N: 108 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - House - House: HB 85 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 18 NV: 24 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: HB 85 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-12 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-06-12 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-05-19 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-14 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 110 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 111 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-14 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS SCS AYES: 111 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-14 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SS, SA 1 and SA 1 SA 1 pending |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, May 6, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 30, Noon or uupon morning recess |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-02-04 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 Adopted AYES: 103 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2021-02-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-02-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-01-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |