MO HB848 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds provisions relating to a claim for breach of implied warranty of habitability by a tenant of rental property
Title
Adds provisions relating to a claim for breach of implied warranty of habitability by a tenant of rental property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |