MO HB846 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions governing the payment of salaries out of the state treasury
Title
Modifies provisions governing the payment of salaries out of the state treasury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2021-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |