MO HB841 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to working animals
Title
Modifies provisions relating to working animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) |
2021-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |