MO HB838 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that certain felons must be eligible for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies that certain felons must be eligible for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2013-04-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-04-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-04-18HouseReferred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities(H)
2013-03-13HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-03-12HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback