MO HB836 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions for the appointment and duties of commissioners to attend an Article V convention
Title
Establishes provisions for the appointment and duties of commissioners to attend an Article V convention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-04-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |