MO HB836 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires adult students to undergo background checks before attending certain classes in public schools.
Title
Requires adult students to undergo background checks before attending certain classes in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |