MO HB831 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a special license plate for the Association of Missouri Electric Cooperatives and the Missouri Association of Municipal Utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a special license plate for the Association of Missouri Electric Cooperatives and the Missouri Association of Municipal Utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 831 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-07-11SenateApproved by Governor (G)
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-08SenateSenate Message (S)
2019-05-08SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-08SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2019-05-08SenateTaken Up
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-05-02SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2019-05-02SenateTaken Up
2019-04-18SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-16SenateRemoved from Consent Calendar (S)
2019-04-11SenateReported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S)
2019-04-11SenateVoted Do Pass Consent (S)
2019-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 8:20am, Senate Lounge
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2019-04-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 1
2019-04-08HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
2019-04-02HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-02HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2019-03-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-13HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-03-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-05HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-27HouseReferred: Utilities(H)
2019-02-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback