MO HB829 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions stating any litigation that Missouri is involved in due to medical marijuana shall be paid out of the Department of Health and Senior Services’ portion of the Missouri Veterans’ Health and Care Fund.
Title
Creates provisions stating any litigation that Missouri is involved in due to medical marijuana shall be paid out of the Department of Health and Senior Services’ portion of the Missouri Veterans’ Health and Care Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 829 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, SCR 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Pensions (S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-06 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |