MO HB82 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles.
Title
Specifies that lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB82&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0067H.01I.pdf |