MO HB815 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the maximum duration of credit transaction that is subject to regulation under the statutes governing credit insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the maximum duration of credit transaction that is subject to regulation under the statutes governing credit insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 815 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-24SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-24SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-16SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, SCR 2
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
2019-04-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-04-08HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePerfected (H)
2019-04-02HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-02HouseTaken Up
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-03-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-03-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-20HouseReferred: Financial Institutions(H)
2019-02-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback