MO HB801 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to water safety and security.
Title
Establishes provisions relating to water safety and security.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kidd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB801&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1786H.01I.pdf |