MO HB784 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the speaker of the house of representatives and the president pro tempore of the senate to appoint marshals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows the speaker of the house of representatives and the president pro tempore of the senate to appoint marshals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House: HB 784 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2021-03-22SenateHouse Message (H)
2021-03-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-03-04HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-04HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-03HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-03-02HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 Adopted
2021-03-02HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-03-02HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-03-02HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-02-22HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-02-17HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-01-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-01-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-01-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-27HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-01-27HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2021-01-27HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-01-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-14HouseReferred: Crime Prevention(H)
2021-01-12HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB784&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0674H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0674H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0674H.02P.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0674H02.02H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0674H02.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0674H02.05H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0784I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0674H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0784C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0674H.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0784P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0674H.02P.ORG.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/034.007.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback