MO HB784 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the speaker of the house of representatives and the president pro tempore of the senate to appoint marshals
Title
Allows the speaker of the house of representatives and the president pro tempore of the senate to appoint marshals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House: HB 784 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 Adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-02 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-01-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-01-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention(H) |
2021-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |