MO HB750 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions relating to asset forfeiture

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions relating to asset forfeiture

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-04-29HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-04-14HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-04-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-04-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-04-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-24HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-03-24HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-23HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-09HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-25HouseReferred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
2021-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-07HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback