MO HB746 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to charges for the service of court orders.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to charges for the service of court orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: HB 746 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: HB 746 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 120 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: HB 746 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 120 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 23, 2019, 12:00pm, SCR 2 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 120 NOES: 26 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-09 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |