MO HB743 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second read and referred: Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Cronkite New Voices Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Cronkite New Voices Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: HB 743 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Education(S)
2019-02-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-02-28HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
2019-02-28HouseTaken Up
2019-02-26HousePerfected (H)
2019-02-26HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-02-26HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-26HouseTaken Up
2019-02-19HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-14HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2019-02-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-31HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2019-01-31HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback