MO HB743 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the distribution of moneys from the Crime Victims' Compensation Fund to the state forensic laboratory account

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the distribution of moneys from the Crime Victims' Compensation Fund to the state forensic laboratory account

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - House: HB 743 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2017-04-25HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-04-24HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-24HouseTaken Up
2017-04-24HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-24HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-04-24HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-04-20HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2017-04-19HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
2017-04-19HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - Governmental Compensation Funds
2017-04-19HouseTaken Up
2017-03-29HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-29HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-20HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-02-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-02-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-09HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-02-01HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2017-01-26HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback