MO HB743 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the establishment of a process by which a student in an unaccredited district who is enrolled in a public school that is not A+ designated can receive reimbursement under the A+ Schools Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the establishment of a process by which a student in an unaccredited district who is enrolled in a public school that is not A+ designated can receive reimbursement under the A+ Schools Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-01HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-03-28HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2013-02-28HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-02-27HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback