MO HB742 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the offense of assault in the first degree and establishes Blair's Law, which creates the offense of unlawful discharge of a firearm for discharging a firearm within or into the limits of a municipality with criminal negligence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the offense of assault in the first degree and establishes Blair's Law, which creates the offense of unlawful discharge of a firearm for discharging a firearm within or into the limits of a municipality with criminal negligence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-04-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-29HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-03-10HouseReferred: Crime Prevention(H)
2021-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-07HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback