MO HB742 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes county drinking water supply lake authorities, prohibits major water users from transporting or diverting certain water, and establishes the Missouri Sustainable Local Food Policy Council
Title
Establishes county drinking water supply lake authorities, prohibits major water users from transporting or diverting certain water, and establishes the Missouri Sustainable Local Food Policy Council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-11 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-11 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-29 | Executive Session Continued | |
2011-03-15 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred: Rural Community Development (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |