MO HB739 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to preventing sexual misconduct in schools.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to preventing sexual misconduct in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House: HB 739 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 7, 2019, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 30, 2019, 1:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 ADOPTED |
2019-04-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |