MO HB738 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies several provisions relating to elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies several provisions relating to elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - House: HB 738 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 738 GENERAL (Y: 119 N: 11 NV: 23 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 738 GENERAL (Y: 116 N: 10 NV: 25 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: HB 738 (HA 7) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 100 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House: HB 738 (*HA 7) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 55 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2021-05-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-04-26SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 1:00 p.m., SCR 1
2021-04-14SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2021-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 14, 1 p.m., SCR 1
2021-04-08SenateSecond read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
2021-03-29HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-03-25HouseThird Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 Adopted AYES: 109 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-25HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-03-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-24HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-03-24HouseRe-Perfected (H)
2021-03-24HouseHS Adopted in House (H)
2021-03-24HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-03-24HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-03-23HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-22HouseHS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-22HouseHS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-11HouseCommitted to: Legislative Review(H)
2021-03-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Adoption of HCS AYES: 116 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 25
2021-03-11HouseMotion to Reconsider Adopted (H) - Perfection AYES: 119 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 23
2021-03-10HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 Adopted
2021-03-10HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-03-10HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-03-10HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-03-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-04HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-03-04HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-28HouseReferred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
2021-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-07HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB738&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1239H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1239H.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1239H.04P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1239H.05F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1239H.05R.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/1239H.05D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.06H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.13H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.08H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.09H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.10H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.11H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.18H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.21H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.31H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.12H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.19H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.22H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.23H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.26H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.33H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.34H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.35H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.36H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.37H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.39H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.42H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.43H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.44H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.45H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.47H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H04.49H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/1239H05.01H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0738I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1239H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0738C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1239H.04C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0738P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/1239H.05R.ORG.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/037.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/037.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/038.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/038.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/042.004.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback