MO HB737 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
2021-03-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-01HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-03-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-22HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-08HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-29HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2021-01-08HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-07HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback