MO HB737 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles
Title
Specifies lawful owners of firearms may transport or store the firearms in locked, privately-owned motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |