MO HB737 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the public school retirement system of the City of St. Louis.
Title
Changes the laws regarding the public school retirement system of the City of St. Louis.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Retirement(H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB737&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0737I.htm |