MO HB728 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the name of the real party in interest to be named in civil actions involving the separation of church and state unless the party in interest is a minor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the name of the real party in interest to be named in civil actions involving the separation of church and state unless the party in interest is a minor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 728 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 102 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 728 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 728 (*HSA 1 HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 41 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 728 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: HB 728 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2019-04-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 101 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 3
2019-04-08HouseTaken Up
2019-04-03HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2019-04-03HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-04-03HouseTaken Up
2019-04-03HousePlaced Back on Perfection Calendar
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-03-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-06HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-02-07HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2019-01-30HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback