MO HB724 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a rebuttable presumption that child custody arrangements that award equal parenting time are in the best interest of the child
Title
Establishes a rebuttable presumption that child custody arrangements that award equal parenting time are in the best interest of the child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-05-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |