MO HB709 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for net metering
Title
Modifies provisions for net metering
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Knight [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2023-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |