MO HB70 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits two-way telecommunications devices and their component parts in correctional centers and jails.
Title
Prohibits two-way telecommunications devices and their component parts in correctional centers and jails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - House: HB 70 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 8, 2019, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-02-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Motion to Re-commit to Committee Failed - to the Committee on Corrections and Public Safety |
2019-02-19 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2018-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |