MO HB699 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding development permits in floodplains.
Title
Changes the laws regarding development permits in floodplains.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB699&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1656H.01I.pdf |