MO HB699 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the court to disclose certain consequences prior to accepting a guilty plea

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the court to disclose certain consequences prior to accepting a guilty plea

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-03-08HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2017-01-24HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-23HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback