MO HB69 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to geographic proximity requirements for nurses in collaborative practice arrangements with physicians
Title
Modifies provisions relating to geographic proximity requirements for nurses in collaborative practice arrangements with physicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |