MO HB685 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the requirements to run for certain public office
Title
Changes the requirements to run for certain public office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - House: HB 685 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: HB 685 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 685 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: HB 685 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 685 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2021-07-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2021-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2021-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2021-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2021-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 152 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 adopted AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 13, 2021, 9:00am, Senate Lounge |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 7, 9:00am, SCR 2 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics(S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |