MO HB682 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits public institutions of higher education from requiring students to live on campus, except for first-year freshmen who may be required to live in campus housing for their first year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits public institutions of higher education from requiring students to live on campus, except for first-year freshmen who may be required to live in campus housing for their first year

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - House: HB 682 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House: HB 682 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 109 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: HB 682 (HA 2 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: HB 682 (*HA 3, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 67 N: 79 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateSecond read and referred: General Laws(S)
2021-05-03HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-05-03HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0
2021-05-03HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 102 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 0
2021-05-03HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-05-03HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-05-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2021-05-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-05-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-04-29HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-04-28HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1,HA 2.HA 4, HA 1 to HA 5, HA 2 to HA 5, HA 3 to HA 5,, HA 5 as amended, HA 6, HA 1 to HA 7, HA 7 as amended, adopted
2021-04-28HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-04-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-04-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-04-20HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-04-19HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2021-03-31HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2021-03-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2021-03-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-23HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2021-03-23HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
2021-03-22HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-03-22HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-03-08HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-02-04HouseReferred: Higher Education(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB682&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0276H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0276H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0276H.02P.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.01H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.02H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.03H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.06H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.08H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.09H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.10H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.11H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.12H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.15H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.16H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.17H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.18H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.19H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.20H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.21H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.22H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.25H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.26H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.27H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.28H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.31H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.32H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.34H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.35H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.36H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.37H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.39H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.40H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.41H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.42H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0276H02.45H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0682I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0276H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0682C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0276H.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0276H.02P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0682P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/061.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/061.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/063.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/063.008.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback