MO HB662 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the misuse of herbicides
Title
Changes the laws regarding the misuse of herbicides
Sponsors
Rep. Don Rone [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 662 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 662 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 662 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 139 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: HB 662 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: HB 662 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 662 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 662 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 139 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: HB 662 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: HB 662 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-03-16 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-03-16 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-03-16 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-03-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 139 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 145 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 1:00pm, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 13, 2017, 2:00 p.m., SCR 2 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2017-02-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-02-23 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-26 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2017-01-20 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |