MO HB66 | 2020 | 1st Extraordinary Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "Pretrial Witness Protection Services Fund"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the "Pretrial Witness Protection Services Fund"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 66 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 66 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 66 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 118 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 66 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 66 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 46 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21SenateDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2020-09-21SenateApproved by Governor (G)
2020-09-16SenateDelivered to Governor
2020-09-16SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-09-16SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-09-09SenateSenate Message (S)
2020-09-02SenateEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-09-02SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-09-02SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-09-02SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-09-02SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-09-02SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-09-01SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, September 2, 2020, Senate Chamber, 9:30a.m.
2020-09-01SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-09-01SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-09-01SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-09-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-09-01SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-08-31SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 11:00 a.m., Tuesday, September 1, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-08-31SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2020-08-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-08-25HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-25HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-25HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-08-25HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2020-08-25HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-25HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-08-25HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-08-24HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-08-24HousePerfected (H)
2020-08-24HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-08-24HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-08-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-08-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-08-17HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-08-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-08-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-08-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-08-12HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2020-08-12HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-08-11HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback