MO HB653 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions relating to mental health insurance coverage.
Title
Changes provisions relating to mental health insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. James Neely [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB653&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1590H.01I.pdf |