MO HB652 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds WIC recipients to those eligible for vouchers for fresh produce
Title
Adds WIC recipients to those eligible for vouchers for fresh produce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1,HA 2, HA 3, HA 1 to HA 4, HA 4 as amended adopted |
2021-04-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |