MO HB646 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to sheltered workshops.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to sheltered workshops.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 646 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 152 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 8, 2019, 12:00pm, Bingham Conference Room, Amended time change |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 8 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 10, 2019, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-06 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass - Not Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass - Not Consent (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |