MO HB643 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-14 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows concealed carrying of firearms on public transportation systems and transporting nonfunctional or unloaded firearms on public buses.
Title
Allows concealed carrying of firearms on public transportation systems and transporting nonfunctional or unloaded firearms on public buses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |