MO HB641 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the concealed carry of firearms on public transportation systems and the transporting of nonfunctioning or unloaded firearms on public buses.
Title
Allows the concealed carry of firearms on public transportation systems and the transporting of nonfunctioning or unloaded firearms on public buses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB641&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1553H.01I.pdf |