MO HB640 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Kansas City Police Department
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Kansas City Police Department
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Sharp [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: HB 640 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: HB 640 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: HB 640 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: HB 640 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 137 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-11 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 3, 2023, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2023-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-02-21 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 5 |
2023-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 3 |
2023-02-21 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 |
2023-02-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-02-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2023-01-31 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-01-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-17 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H) |
2023-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |