MO HB639 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 10 as School Bus Drivers' Appreciation Day in Missouri
Title
Designates May 10 as School Bus Drivers' Appreciation Day in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |