MO HB634 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions related to charter schools
Title
Changes provisions related to charter schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (HA 1, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (HA 1, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (HA 2 HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 60 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 83 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 82 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (HA 1, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 112 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (HA 1, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 113 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (HA 2 HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 60 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 83 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 82 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: HB 634 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 109 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 11, 2017, 12:00pm, SCR 1 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 83 NOES: 76 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-16 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended, HA 2 adopted AYES: 83 NOES: 74 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) - AYES: 82 NOES: 74 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-03-15 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-15 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-02-06 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-01-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |