MO HB624 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits vehicle platooning on Missouri roads
Title
Permits vehicle platooning on Missouri roads
Sponsors
Rep. John Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred: Transportation Infrastructure(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |